SRI VINOD KUMAR-IIIDistrict & Sessions Judge Bareilly |
Id No: | UP5401 |
Father's/Husband's Name: | BADRI NARAIN DUBEY |
Date of Birth: | 15-10-1964 |
Date of Retirement: | 31-10-2024 |
Home District: | Gorakhpur |
Home State: | Uttar Pradesh |
Date of Appt. in Judicial Service as Munsif/CJ(JD): | 08-06-1990 |
Date of Promotion in CJ/CJ(SD): | 06-09-1999 |
Date of Conf. on Munsif/CJ(JD): | 21-03-1997 |
Date of Promotion to Class-I: | 06-09-1999 |
Date of Joining in HJS under Rule 22(3) of UP HJS Rule 1975: |
|
Date of Joining in HJS under Rule 22(1) of UP HJS Rule 1975: |
15-12-2008 |
Date of Conf. in HJS: |
Qualification Details | |||
SL | DETAILS | DIVISION | YEAR |
1. | B.A. | Second | 1983 |
2. | LL.B. | Second | 1986 |
Training Details | |||
SL | SUBJECT | INSTITUTE | FROM-TO |
1. | Refresher Course | I.J.T.R., U.P. Lucknow | 29-04-93 - 07-05-93 |
2. | Special Training Programme | I.J.T.R., U.P. Lucknow | 13-10-08 - 17-10-08 |
3. | Refresher Training Programme for Addl. District Judges under 13th finance Commission Scheme | I.J.T.R., U.P. Lucknow | 12-08-13 - 16-08-13 |
4. | Special Training Programme on Managerial Effectiveness at IIM, Lucknow | 17-02-14 - 21-02-14 | |
5. | Ubuntu-Linux 14.04 Cum CIS Training Programme | I.J.T.R., U.P. Lucknow | 24-08-15 - 25-08-15 |
6. | Training Programme on UBUNTU 16.04 & CIS 2.0 | I.J.T.R., U.P. Lucknow | 19-02-18 - 20-02-18 |
7. | Special Training Programme on Management for Judicial Officers | IIPA, New Delhi | 26-11-18 - 30-11-18 |
8. | Refresher Training Programme for Addl. District & Sessions Judges | I.J.T.R., U.P. Lucknow | 07-01-19 - 11-01-19 |
Posting Details | |||
SL |
DESIGNATION PLACE |
FROM TO |
REMARKS |
1. |
Addl. Munsif Kasia-Deoria |
08-06-1990 01-06-1992 |
|
2. |
Addl. Munsif Balrampur-Gonda |
08-06-1992 17-07-1992 |
|
3. |
Addl. Munsif Gonda |
17-07-1992 15-06-1995 |
|
4. |
Addl. Civil Judge (Junior Div.) Sambhal-Moradabad |
17-06-1995 02-06-1997 |
|
5. |
Addl. Civil Judge (Junior Div.) Agra |
04-06-1997 05-06-1998 |
|
6. |
Judicial Magistrate Agra |
05-06-1998 18-01-1999 |
|
7. |
Addl. Civil Judge (Junior Div.) Agra |
18-01-1999 05-06-1999 |
|
8. |
Judicial Magistrate Agra |
05-06-1999 06-09-1999 |
|
9. |
Addl. Chief Judicial Magistrate Agra |
06-09-1999 05-06-2000 |
|
10. |
Addl. Chief Metropolitan Magistrate Kanpur Nagar |
06-06-2000 18-07-2003 |
|
11. |
Civil Judge (Senior Div.) Azamgarh |
21-07-2003 06-06-2005 |
|
12. |
Chief Judicial Magistrate Azamgarh |
06-06-2005 22-09-2005 |
|
13. |
Addl. District & Sessions Judge Azamgarh |
22-09-2005 06-06-2006 |
Fast Track |
14. |
Addl. District & Sessions Judge Kairana-Muzaffarnagar |
09-06-2006 15-12-2008 |
Fast Track |
15. |
Addl. District & Sessions Judge Muzaffar Nagar |
15-12-2008 07-06-2010 |
|
16. |
Addl. District & Sessions Judge Moradabad |
08-06-2010 19-08-2010 |
|
17. |
Addl. District & Sessions Judge Chandausi-Moradabad |
19-08-2010 15-04-2013 |
|
18. |
Addl. District & Sessions Judge Ghaziabad |
16-04-2013 12-05-2015 |
|
19. |
Spl. Judge (E.C. Act) Ghaziabad |
12-05-2015 18-05-2015 |
|
20. |
Addl. District & Sessions Judge Ghaziabad |
18-05-2015 07-05-2016 |
|
21. |
Addl. District & Sessions Judge Lakhimpur Kheri |
09-05-2016 02-08-2018 |
|
22. |
Ist Addl. District & Sessions Judge Lakhimpur Kheri |
02-08-2018 01-01-2019 |
|
23. |
District & Sessions Judge Fatehpur |
01-01-2019 18-11-2019 |
|
24. |
Presiding Officer Commercial Court Varanasi |
19-11-2019 09-07-2020 |
Deputation |
25. |
District & Sessions Judge Prayagraj |
11-07-2020 20-01-2021 |
|
26. |
District & Sessions Judge Basti |
21-01-2021 02-09-2022 |
|
27. |
District & Sessions Judge Bareilly |
03-09-2022 |